Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
436 Lafayette Developers Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Davis, Tarik, Judell, Lynn Ellen, Pretter, David J., Sasson, Alan J, Zachter, Jeffrey S, (total of 5) See All against Dorla Alleyne, represented by Stewart, Leonard W., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Nuisance, Etc.) |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is filed by 436 Lafayette Developers LLC against Dorla Alleyne. The plaintiff, 436 Lafayette Developers LLC, is a limited liability company that owns a property located at 436 Lafayette Avenue, Brooklyn, New York. The defendant, Dorla ...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 18, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 11, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: December 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 13, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 16, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 21, 2018NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 25, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 06, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 26, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 06, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 13, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 10, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 12, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 26, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 26, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: March 01, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 26, 2018ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 02, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 26, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 08, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: June 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #9)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: August 15, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: February 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 12, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 26, 2017SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: September 07, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2017RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 10, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 19, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 28, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 09, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 02, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 31, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #11)
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #11)
Date: September 08, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #11)
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: September 08, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 31, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 17, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: June 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 05, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 04, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 30, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: April 11, 2024NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: February 15, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING | ||
April 11, 2024 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Seeking an adjournment of pending contempt hearing |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Advanced Engineering Report |
||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 02, 2024 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 01.18.2024 Motion Notice and Calendar |
||
November 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
October 31, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT 11.16.2023 Motion Notice and Calendar |
||
October 12, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #11) dated 10/6/23 |
||
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #11) client affidavit of merit |
||
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #11) attorney affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.