Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rose Altman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rosenbaum, Craig Daniel, against Acadia 3780-3858 Nostrand Avenue Llc, Acadia Nostrand Avenue Llc, Nostrand Properties, Llc, Realty Equity Holdings 3820, Llc, represented by Bender, Heath A, Coviello, Jennifer Louise, Gallo, David A, Winter, Michael James, Wolthoff, John L, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Devin P presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1071 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 28, 2017ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 28, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 21, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 24, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 28, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 31, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 13, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2015PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2015NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2) D- Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2016AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2016PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 22, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 05, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: July 28, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 28, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 28, 2017ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2018AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2017AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 24, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 09, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 07, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 16, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 17, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 29, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 01, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 11, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 06, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART NO NOI (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Devin P. |
|
March 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE-FINAL CONFERENCE PART NO ORD (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Devin P. |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
February 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned NOTE OF ISSUE/NO APPEARANCE MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 12/15/17 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #009) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GEXT (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #008) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART GSF (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #8) AFF IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION & PARTIAL OPP TO PLF MOTOION |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #9) NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.