Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
James Geoffrey, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Herbert, Jason Todd, Kaufer, Jason Mitchel, Krentsel, Steven, against Extell Development Company, Silverlining Interiors, Inc., Smitell B-1 Llc, Sunshine Mf Ii Llc, represented by Dunn, Timothy Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter P. Sweeney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 07, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: January 19, 2024COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 19, 2024THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 27, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: December 27, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 13, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 14, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 19, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: January 16, 2024STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 13, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 16, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 05, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 05, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 05, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 13, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 13, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 13, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 13, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS SUPPLEMENTAL BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 19, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 15, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 19, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2023ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 20, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental Bill of Particulars etc Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 31, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
January 19, 2024 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
January 19, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of an order entered 1/8/2024 |
||
January 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUNSHINE MF II LLC / AFFIDAVIT |
||
January 16, 2024 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) Reply to Cross-Claims of Premium Grade Millwork Corp. |
||
January 08, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 27, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
December 27, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) | ||
December 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Entry of Order Entered on 12/13/23 |
||
December 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.