Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The New Hope Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Johnson, Angelyn Dione, Levine, Jason R, Torto, Thomas, against New York State Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Ira Harkavy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time716 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 30, 2017PETITION
Date: August 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 20, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 01, 2016NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 01, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2015NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 01, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 01, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 24, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 20, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 04, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 27, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 13, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 01, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2017 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 31, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 30, 2017 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 30, 2017 |
ORDER - OTHER dated 7/20/16 |
||
January 26, 2017 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Appeal of Hon. Jimenez-Salta's 12/16/16 Order |
||
January 20, 2017 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 28, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 28, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 27, 2016 |
ORDER - OTHER dated 12/23/16 |
||
December 16, 2016 | Hearing |
Denied (Motion #004) Motion Trial Term 88 SFO, BY FAMEK MGMT CORP (Conversion) Judge: Jimenez Salta, Hon. Dawn M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.