Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Caroline Borrino, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Doumanian, Anelga Artun, Marsh, James R., Marsh Law Firm, Pcva Law, against Diocese Of Brooklyn, Our Lady Of Guadalupe Church And School, Sisters Of St. Dominic, Sisters Of St. Joseph, represented by Camacho-Moran, Domenique, Chiara, Giuseppe, Gallagher, Timothy Madigan, Lynch, Michael Charles, Merkl, Neil M, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Alexander M. Tisch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint was filed in the New York State Supreme Court, Kings County. The plaintiff, Caroline Borrino, is suing the Diocese of Brooklyn and Our Lady of Guadalupe Church and School. The complaint alleges that the Diocese knew about and failed to...
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: July 10, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 08, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: March 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 12, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 02, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: August 15, 2022ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2022STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) *Corrected*
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 12, 2021ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 02, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 12, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: April 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 18, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: October 14, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: September 18, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: December 29, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 21, 2020NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 21, 2020ORDER - AMENDED
Date: March 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 21, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 21, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 21, 2020ORDER - AMENDED
Date: March 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 18, 2023ORDER - AMENDED
Date: March 16, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 02, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 10, 2024STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 02, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #7)
Date: October 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 02, 2024ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 18, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: September 25, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 29, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: February 23, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 28, 2024SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 14, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 26, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 23, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 29, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #7)
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Subpoena Ad Testificandum - Robert Bulone |
||
April 03, 2024 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 29, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #8) | ||
March 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #8) Second Amended Complaint -- Pursuant to Section VI of the Confidentiality Order, Emailed to court on January 18, 2024 and courtesy copy sent March 29, 2024 |
||
March 29, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Follow Up CVA Compliance Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
March 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #8) Caroline Borrino Deposition Excerpts -- Pursuant to Section VI of the Confidentiality Order, Emailed to court on January 18, 2024 and courtesy copy sent March 29, 2024 |
||
March 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #8) Memorandum of Law -- Pursuant to Section VI of the Confidentiality Order, Emailed to court on January 18, 2024 and courtesy copy sent March 29, 2024 |
||
March 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 17 (Motion #8) Pilpel Personnal File Excerpt -- Pursuant to Section VI of the Confidentiality Order, Emailed to court on January 18, 2024 and courtesy copy sent March 29, 2024 |
||
March 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #8) Srs of Srt. Dominic Resp to NTP -- Pursuant to Section VI of the Confidentiality Order, Emailed to court on January 18, 2024 and courtesy copy sent March 29, 2024 |
||
March 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #8) Kelly-Stiles Deposition Excerpts -- Pursuant to Section VI of the Confidentiality Order, Emailed to court on January 18, 2024 and courtesy copy sent March 29, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.