Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Zaborski, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kallfa, Evis, Platta, Slawomir Wieslaw, Taub, Michael L, Vannella, Brian James, Wierzbicki, Pawel Piotr, (total of 5) See All against Cornerstone Builders Ny Llc, Mb Lorimer Llc, represented by Boeckle, Nicole, Rolle, Lisa M, Bundock, Thomas Herbert, Jaffery, Ali R., Reid, Aoife, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Debra Silber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra Silber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 14, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 15, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 09, 2017ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 31, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 09, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2017NOTE OF ISSUE (JURY DEMAND PREV PAID)
Date: February 14, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 01, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 18, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 13, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 08, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 14, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 03, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 18, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 06, 2018ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 28, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: June 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2017CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2017NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2017ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 05, 2018NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 01, 2017THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 18, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2017SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 04, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: May 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 14, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 15, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 21, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: June 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 03, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 03, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #5)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2017ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3) Plaintiff's transcripts Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 19, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS SERVED Plaintiff's Subpoenas Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 22, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 23, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 23, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's 3101d Exchange - Aric Hausknecht, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 30, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's 3101d Exchange - Kornelia Teslic, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's 3101d Exchange - Avraham Schweiger, Ph.D Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's 3101d Exchange - Dr. Kenneth McCulloch, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 27, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS All served Plaintiff's Duces Tecum Subpoenas Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR All served Plaintiff's Duces Tecum Subpoenas Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 19, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS All served Plaintiff's So-Ordered Duces Tecum Subpoenas Redacted per 22 NYCRR All served Plaintiff's So-Ordered Duces Tecum Subpoenas Redacted |
||
January 19, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS All served Plaintiff's Ad testificandum Subpoenas |
||
January 19, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Served Plaintiff's Duces Tecum & Ad Testificandum Subpoena to New York Builders of Stairs Redacted per 22 NYCRR Served Plaintiff's Duces Tecum & Ad Testificandum Subpoena to New York Builders of Stairs Redacted |
||
January 18, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Dr. Teslic - Medical Report Referenced in Plaintiff's 3101(d) dated December 23, 2022 -Exchange |
||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
January 17, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's Supplemental 3101d Exchange - Avraham Schweiger, Ph.D Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Supplemental 3101d Exchange - Avraham Schweiger, Ph.D Redacted |
||
December 30, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's Notice of Witness Exchange |
||
December 27, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's 3101d Exchange - Aric Hausknecht, M.D. Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's 3101d Exchange - Aric Hausknecht, M.D. Redacted |
||
December 27, 2022 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's Supplemental 3101d Exchange - Daniel Wolstein, PhD. Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Supplemental 3101d Exchange - Daniel Wolstein, PhD. Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.