Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
David Maundrell, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Licatesi, Anthony J., against Alter Wolff Foley & Stutman Llp, Elliot Scheinberg Esq., Michael D. Stutman Esq., Stutman, Stutman & Lichtenstein Llp, represented by Barham, Aaron Michael, Yachkouri, Victoria Anne, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Francois A Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Other Professional Malpractice (Legal Malpractice) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This legal document is a complaint filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, David Maundrell, is suing multiple defendants, including Michael D. Stutman, Esq., Stutman, Stutman & Lichtenstein LLP, Alter Wolf...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 14, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 14, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 12, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 14, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 14, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
February 14, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
February 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Honorable Delores J. Thomas, J.S.C.s Post-Judgment Hearing Decision, dated December 30, 2022; |
||
February 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) email correspondence from Michael D. Stutman, Esq., dated June 8, 2023 |
||
February 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) email correspondence from Attorney Scheinberg, dated June 8, 2023 |
||
February 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) email correspondence between Plaintiff and Attorney Scheinberg, dated June 5, 2023 and June 6, 2023, email correspondence between Plaintiff and Attorney Scheinberg, dated June 5, 2023 and June 6, 2023, ... show more |
||
February 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Verified Complaint |
||
February 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of the Judgment, dated April 27, 2023; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.