Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Kenneth Miller, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Givas, Thomas Peter, against David Strothers, Eric Bevard, Gretchen Bevard, represented by Bradley, Roger W., Slye, Robert J., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with James P. Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Declaratory Judgment/Ease) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of New York, County of Jefferson. The plaintiff, Kenneth Miller, is suing the defendants, Charles Peter Hunkele Jr. and David Strothers, over a dispute regarding easements on a property in...
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6) *Corrected*
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: May 24, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 10, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 26, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 24, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 05, 2020INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: October 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 01, 2020TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 01, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 10, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 08, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 03, 2020PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 03, 2020PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 06, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT *Corrected*
Date: August 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - e  (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: August 05, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 26, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 13, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 07, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 27, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 31, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: October 06, 2022COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 28, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8) *Corrected*
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 17, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected*
Date: October 17, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 25, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2019COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 20, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 21, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: August 15, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 15, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 15, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 25, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 03, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 03, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 19, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 19, 2019ORDER - VACATING NOTE OF ISSUE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 08, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 08, 2019COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 13, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 06, 2019RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: January 25, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 02, 2018ANSWER
Date: July 18, 2018NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: July 09, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 09, 2018ANSWER
Date: July 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 20, 2018ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 07, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2018ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 09, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 02, 2021TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Date: June 01, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) | ||
October 06, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
March 28, 2022 | COURT NOTICE (Motion #8) | ||
March 28, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #8) | ||
March 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #8) AOS |
||
March 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #8) 1. Email |
||
March 24, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #8) Affirmation of Roger Bradley |
||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #8) Exhibit D - Amended Complaint |
||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #8) Exhibit A - Order and Judgment 06.21.2021 |
||
February 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #8) Exhibit C - Original Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.