Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nathan Littauer Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Joanne Rudd, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, NY, . Fulton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFulton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 11, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Agreement to Vacate Judgment and Stipulation to Discontinue |
||
February 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.