Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dennis Walsh, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Mcardle, Matthew Henry, against Alex Willett D B A Willett Construction, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, NY, . Franklin County, NY Superior Courts with John T Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 15, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Confirm Arbitration Award) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationFranklin County, NY |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 15, 2022PETITION
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 15, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 15, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 15, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: July 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 29, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 04, 2022JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: October 11, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
October 04, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) | ||
September 13, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | ||
September 13, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Fees |
||
September 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 29, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 05, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.