Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kathleen Kammer, Patrick Lawrence Individually And As Resident Representative Of Kathleen Kammer, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Duerr, Sheila Goss, Flink, Edward B., against 185 Old Military Road, Llc D B A Elderwood Of Uihlein At Lake Placid, 185 Old Military Road Operating Company, Llc, represented by Verone Juliano, Christina Marie, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Kathleen Kammer and Patrick Lawrence against 185 Old Military Road Operating Company, LLC and 185 Old Military Road, LLC, doing business as Elderwood of Uihlein at Lake Placid. The plaintiffs allege neglige...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Medical Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 22, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 22, 2024SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 10, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 24, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 11, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: October 11, 2023SUMMONS
Date: October 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
January 22, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 22, 2024 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 19, 2024 |
SUR-REPLY (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law |
||
January 19, 2024 |
SUR-REPLY (Motion #1) Affirmation |
||
January 10, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 27, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 15, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 14, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
December 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Rachel Tart |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.