Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rocket Mortgage, Llc F K A Quicken Loans, Llc F K A Quicken Loans Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Jacobs, Jonathan Wayne, Polowy, Amy E., Puscheck, Kathleen Elizabeth, against Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Cynthia May Corcoran As Executor And As Devisee To The Estate Of Steven Ladue, Inheritance Advanced Llc, John Doe, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Rocket Mortgage, LLC (formerly known as Quicken Loans, LLC) against Cynthia May Corcoran as the executor and devisee to the estate of Steven Ladue, as well as other unknown individuals and entities. The...
Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors, And Assignees Of Such Deceased, Any And All Persons Deriving Interest In Or Lien Upon, Or Title To Said Real Property By, Through Or Under Them, Or Either Of Them, And Their
Respective Wives, Widows, Husbands, Widowers, Heirs At Law, Next Of Kin, Descendants, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Legatees, Creditors, Trustees, Committees, Lienors, And Assigns, All Of Whom And Whose Names, Except As Stated,
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 31, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 24, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING-ERIN GONYEA SHA JANE DOE #1 |
||
November 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING-JOHN WARNER SHA JOHN DOE#1 |
||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE IRS |
||
November 01, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 3215 Mailing- ERIN GONYEA SHA JANE DOE #1 |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- ERIN GONYEA SHA JANE DOE #1 |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of 3215 Mailing- JOHN WARNER SHA JOHN DOE #1 |
||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- INHERITANCE ADVANCED LLC |
||
October 31, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- JOHN WARNER SHA JOHN DOE #1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.