Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Claire E. Pietrzak, Marc A. Doering, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Norfolk, Matthew Dominic, against Alex Willett, Willett Construction, represented by Crotty, John Michael, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: September 01, 2022SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: September 07, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 23, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 23, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 29, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 23, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
December 23, 2022 | Preliminary Conference Request | ||
December 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 09, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
October 19, 2022 | COMPLAINT | ||
October 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Willett's Written Agreement |
||
September 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
September 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Alex Willett |
||
September 16, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on Willett Construction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.