Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Cody J. Nichols, John Doe, Manufacturers And Traders Trust Company, represented by Callocchia, Frank C, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Donna Siwek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonna Siwek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 18, 2022OATH
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - vi  (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - v  (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - iv  (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - iii  (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - ii  (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - Pi  (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 26, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - - Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 01, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 03, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: February 03, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 22, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - RJI Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - iii  (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - iv  (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - v  (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - ii  (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - Ti  (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004) RPAPL 1304 90 Day Notice
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003) RPAPL & 1304 90 Day Notice
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 03, 2023OATH
Date: June 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) Mortgage |
||
November 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) Assignments |
||
November 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Note |
||
November 01, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) Filed by KAK - 105180 |
||
November 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) Certificate of Merit |
||
November 01, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS (Motion #004) | ||
November 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - iii (Motion #004) Affidavits of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.