Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Wenzel, Scott Louis, against Jamilla Peay, Prudential Assigned Settlement Services Corp., Prudential Insurance Company Of America, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynn W Keane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sspa) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: April 07, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 17, 2022PETITION
Date: April 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
June 17, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Order |
||
June 10, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 20, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 18, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 07, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) | ||
April 07, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation |
||
April 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule |
||
April 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.