Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Amanda Adams, Donald Hanavan, Patricia Hanavan, Spencer Kowal, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Election Law case represented by Rosenbluth, Sarah Lily, against Jeremy Zellner, Ralph Mohr, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Paul B. Wojtaszek presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Election Law |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of Erie County, New York. The petitioners, Spencer Kowal, Amanda Adams, Donald Hanavan, and Patricia Hanavan, are aggrieved voters who are challenging the constitutionality of certain prov...
APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY)
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: April 18, 2023RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: December 08, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 18, 2023PETITION
Date: February 05, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 18, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: February 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: March 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) | ||
December 08, 2023 | RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) | ||
April 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
April 18, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
April 10, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
April 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Transcript |
||
April 03, 2023 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
April 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Transcript |
||
March 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Kowal affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.