Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jacob Rosado, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cohn, Mikael Ari, against Dejuan Koonce, represented by Rubinstein, Heather Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: March 10, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 10, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 18, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 19, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 27, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 27, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 08, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 07, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: March 09, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 09, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 16, 2023STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 29, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: July 26, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 10, 2023PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: July 26, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 09, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 16, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE - SO ORDERED | ||
August 16, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
August 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
August 16, 2023 | Affidavit of Medicare Eligibility | ||
August 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 04, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 26, 2023 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
July 26, 2023 |
PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) Dr.Wiener CV |
||
March 09, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.