Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ccrnc, Crnc Llc Dba Cortland Park Rehabilitation And Nursing Center, Crown Park Rehabilitation And Nursing Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Eyre, Kara Marie, Mervis, Harvey D., Semlies, Lori Rosen, against Carol Alexander, Paul Alexander, represented by Van De Mark, Allan Charles, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 06, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 31, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: September 06, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: April 28, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 28, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 31, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 13, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 12, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter Decision and Order |
||
September 08, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
September 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) demands |
||
September 06, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
September 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Ans to Counterclaims |
||
September 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
September 06, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.