Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Rocket Mortgage, Llc Fka Quicken Loans, Llc Fka Quicken Loans Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C M, against John Doe, Justin L. Earl, Mary Doe, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Foreclosure Settlement Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Settlement Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Search Results Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2024RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 26, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 04, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 30, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Search Results Redacted per 22 NYCRR Search Results Redacted |
||
January 05, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit |
||
December 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
December 14, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
December 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
May 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
April 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
March 30, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Additional Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.