Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Louis Bombardier, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Meyer, Justin Robert, against Jamie Menard, represented by Rubin, Daniel Sidney Lawrence, Watson, Bonnie Rose, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 01, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 10, 2023SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI
Date: February 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 10, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 14, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 17, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 22, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 22, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 22, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 22, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 17, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Daniel S. L. Rubin, Esq. in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Comp Affirmation of Daniel S. L. Rubin, Esq. in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Comp ... show more |
||
February 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit of Jamie Menard in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint and in S Affidavit of Jamie Menard in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint and in S ... show more |
||
February 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
February 16, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.