Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Corrie Culver, in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY, . Chenango County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChenango County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 08, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 07, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: November 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: December 21, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 09, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 |
JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
December 21, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Entered by County Clerk |
||
December 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
December 15, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
November 07, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 07, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Attorney Affidavit |
||
November 07, 2022 | Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status | ||
November 07, 2022 | Affidavit of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
November 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement |
||
November 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.