Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
State Of New York Mortgage Agency, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Edwards, Joshua Ricardo, Risalvato, Anthony Joseph, against John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, New York State Department Of Labor, New York State Department Of Labor Unemployment Insurance Division Commissioner Of Labor, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Randall L. Paddock As Administrator And Heir-Atlaw Of The Estate Of Chandler V. Paddock; Iris J. Paddock As Heir-At-Law Of The Estate Of Chandler V. Paddock, (total of 8) See All represented by Roach, Mary Keefe, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by the State of New York Mortgage Agency against the defendants. The defendants include Randall L. Paddock, Iris J. Paddock, the State of New York Mortgage Agency, the New York State Department of Taxation...
John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2023CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D EXHIBIT D Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C EXHIBIT C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B EXHIBIT B Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A EXHIBIT A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F EXHIBIT F Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E EXHIBIT E Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 14, 2023 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
November 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 27, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE - NO DOES |
||
October 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA O/B/O INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE |
||
October 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -RANDALL L. PADDOCK, AS ADMINISTRATOR AND HEIR-AT-LAW OF THE ESTATE OF CHANDLER AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE -RANDALL L. PADDOCK, AS ADMINISTRATOR AND HEIR-AT-LAW OF THE ESTATE OF CHANDLER ... show more |
||
October 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - IRIS J. PADDOCK AS HEIR-AT-LAW OF THE ESTATE OF CHANDLER V. PADDOCK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.