Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Patrick Pupera, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Hites, William Ronald, against Ann Marie Buchanan, represented by Shelby, Kevin Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Intentional Tort And Cons) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2018ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2018ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 17, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: January 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1) | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) | |
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) | |
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Lis Pendens |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) *Corrected* Purpera List of Personal Property |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Order of Protection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.