Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fay, Richard Patrick, Jurek, Amber Augustine, against Arthur J Carnicelli, Mary Ann Carnicelli, United States Of America Acting Through The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas G Leone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: May 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 17, 2017COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 30, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 17, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 05, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 15, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 27, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 07, 2017SUMMONS
Date: August 17, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 17, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 21, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 20, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 06, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 21, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 02, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 02, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 10, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 19, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 08, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 01, 2022CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 01, 2022 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
February 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 30, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
May 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 25, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 12, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
May 12, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
November 02, 2020 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.