Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Reta Mckee, Roger Mckee, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Armstrong, Donald Charles, against New York State Department Of Motor Vehicles, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Eugene D Faughnan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
This legal document is a complaint and verification filed by Roger McKee and Reta McKee, represented by Pomeroy Armstrong & Casullo, LLP. They are seeking a court order to compel the New York State Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) to issue a Certif...
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: December 12, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 04, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 03, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: December 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: December 05, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 05, 2023PETITION
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 03, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 03, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 19, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 12, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
December 06, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSGINMENT NOTICE |
||
December 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I |
||
December 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H Emails |
||
December 05, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Property Description Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.