Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
City Of Binghamton, New York, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Hite, Robert Scott, against Not Applicable. Map 9, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Condemnation |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
This complaint is a petition filed by the City of Binghamton, New York, seeking authorization to acquire a fee interest in a portion of a parcel of land known as 10 Main Street. The purpose of the acquisition is to construct the Main Street Corridor ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) to Support Motion. Emails to NYCEF Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: November 11, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 11, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 16, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: October 12, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 12, 2023PETITION
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Sevice.Notice of Acquisition |
||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff.of Service.Not.of Entry |
||
December 07, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Decision and Order signed 12.07.23 |
||
November 16, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE |
||
November 15, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 14, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) - CORRECTED CLERICAL ERRORS AND ASSIGNED TO SUPPORT PROPER MOTION TO DISMISS |
||
November 14, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) to Support Motion. Emails to NYCEF Redacted per 22 NYCRR to Support Motion. Emails to NYCEF Redacted |
||
November 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) to Support Motion. Transcript of calls with Clerk |
||
November 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) - CORRECTED CLERICAL ERRORS AND ASSIGNED TO PROPER MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.