Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
David Dymock, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Breakstone, Samantha Allyne, Feldshon, Arielle Zoe, Leder, Linc, Papiasvili, Philip, Slater, Joseph M, (total of 5) See All against Broome County, Broome County Department Of Social Services, Children'S Home Of Wyoming Conference, The Upper New York Conference Of The United Methodist Church, Wyoming Conference Of The United Methodist Church, (total of 5) See All represented by Beaudoin, Bryan Kirkland, Fellows, Jonathan Boyce, Gaunce, Nicholas Morgan, Hill, Joshua David, Mcmahon, Timothy N, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Christopher P. Baker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher P. Baker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Broome. The plaintiff, David Dymock, is suing Broome County, Broome County Department of Social Services, Children's Home of Wyoming Conference, Wyoming...
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 23, 2024STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 04, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 04, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 12, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 12, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 29, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 16, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 29, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 25, 2024 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance as to Defendants Wyoming Conference of the United Methodist Church and The Upper New York Conference of the United Methodist Church |
||
April 23, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 19, 2024 |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE Adjournment Order |
||
April 17, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) | ||
April 15, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) October 27, 2023 letter |
||
April 12, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) | ||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Decision & Order |
||
April 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Letter dated August 30, 2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.