Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nadine Brooks, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Capri Landscaping, Inc, Shawn Delmore, The City Of New York, represented by Montalvo, Richard Michael, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8) OSC Papers Served
Date: January 12, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7) Exhibit D - Death Certificate
Date: June 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8) Exhibit D - Death Certificate
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 31, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 12, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #8) DATED 05/15/2023 |
||
February 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #8) Notice of Entry |
||
February 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #8) Notice of Settlement W/ Order |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #8) Affirmation of Service |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #8) Exhibit B - Affirmation of Service |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #8) Exhibit A - Order dated 1/16/2023 |
||
January 31, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #8) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 1/26/2023 |
||
January 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #8) OSC Papers Served OSC Papers Served Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #8) Affidavit Of Service |
||
January 10, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #8) Exhibit F - Order dated 10-18-2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.