Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Grace Edwards Simon, Leon Simon, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Martino, Douglas J., against Bernard E Lewis, Coleen Weaver Aka Coleen Whyte As Administrator Of The Ethans Estate Trust, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Elizabeth Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Taylor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Adverse Possession) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #12)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #12)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #12)
Date: December 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #12)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: December 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - l  (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - i  (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #13) *Corrected*
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #13) *Corrected*
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 19, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #12)
Date: October 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #13) *Corrected*
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #12)
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - l  (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: January 21, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: January 09, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 21, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: December 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #15) Notice of appearance filed by Jack A. Addesso of Jack A; Addesso, PLLC |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #15) Complaint filed against Lewis |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #15) Affidavit of service upon Grace Edwards |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #15) Order signed by Judge Rodriguez on July 31, 2020 |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #15) Consent to Change attorney from Lawrence Garey to Albert Hatem |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R (Motion #15) Affirmation in opposition to Lewis motion to dismiss |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #15) Affidavit in further support |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - V (Motion #15) Notice of appearance filed by Douglas J.Martino |
||
January 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #15) Order signed by Judge Rodriguez on January 16, 2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.