Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Orell Gaynor, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ross, Matthew J, against Andaleeb Raja Md, Eduardo J Rodriguez Perez Md, Lincoln Medical And Mental Health Center, New York City Hospital Police Department, New York City Police Department, (total of 9) See All represented by Counsel, Corporation, Kleinman, Dyan Lauren, Vaughan, Tamika Ellen, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: April 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 26, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 24, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 15, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2022ORDER - INTERIM Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 26, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 26, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) Short form order dated 11/13/2023 WITHDRAWN |
||
November 01, 2023 |
INTERROGATORIES Defendant Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories |
||
August 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Honorable Danziger regarding compliance with May 11, 2023 Order |
||
June 09, 2023 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
May 05, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Danziger Regarding Redacted Records of Assailant's Behavior |
||
May 03, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
March 24, 2023 |
ORDER - INTERIM (Motion #3) dated 3-16-2023 |
||
February 22, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 02, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER IN CAMERA ORDER DATED 2/1/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.