Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sarah Rodriguez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Finelli, Charles Edward, against Cdc 111Th Street Realty, L.P., Cdc East 105Th Street Realty, L.P., represented by Giardino, John J., Goos, Stanley, Major, Andre Justin, Saady, Nicholas George, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Kim A. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim A. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management674 days |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 07, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 05, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 07, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2017NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2017SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER - RENEW/REARGUE Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: December 04, 2019NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: November 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R-2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 31, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - R-1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE
Date: September 04, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R-3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R-4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 21, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 03, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 30, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 16, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 05, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affidavit of Mr. Jose Tejada in Support of Defendants' Motion to Vacate Default Judgment |
||
January 05, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #3) Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition |
||
January 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Supplemental Affidavit of Mr. William Guerrero in Support of Defendants' Motion to Vacate Default Ju Supplemental Affidavit of Mr. William Guerrero in Support of Defendants' Motion to Vacate Default Ju ... show more |
||
December 21, 2022 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Stipulation Adjourning Defendants' Motion to Vacate to January 6, 2023 |
||
December 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 22, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
November 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
October 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
October 21, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST | ||
October 03, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant CDC East 105th Street Realty, L.P. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.