Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
National Building Supply Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bart J Klein, against Dan Sachkowsky, Nj Home Builder & Renovations, represented by Pauline F Tutelo, in the jurisdiction of Ocean County, NJ, . Ocean County, NJ Superior Courts with Valter H Must presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValter H Must Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOcean County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeSettled Prior To Settlement Conference |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 24, 2022COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 21, 2022COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 01, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Judge: VALTER H MUST |
||
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by KLEIN, BART, J of BART J. KLEIN on behalf of NATIONAL BUILDING SUPPLY CORP. A DIVISION OF SRS DISTRIBUTION INC against NJ HOME BUILDER & RENOVATIONS LLC, DAN SACHKOWSKY *LINKED FILING* | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/12/2023 re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20231509862] | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/10/2023 will be decided on 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20231509862] | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT submitted by KLEIN, BART, J of BART J. KLEIN on behalf of NATIONAL BUILDING SUPPLY CORP. A DIVISION OF SRS DISTRIBUTION INC against NJ HOME BUILDER & RENOVATIONS LLC, DAN SACHKOWSKY *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2023 |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ARNOLD B GOLDMAN |
||
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by KLEIN, BART, J of BART J. KLEIN on behalf of NATIONAL BUILDING SUPPLY CORP. A DIVISION OF SRS DISTRIBUTION INC against NJ HOME BUILDER & RENOVATIONS LLC, DAN SACHKOWSKY | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES-Granted by Judge MUST, VALTER, H re: MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES [LCV2023565397] | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Judge: VALTER H MUST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.