Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tamera Dobbins, Vincent Dobbins, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lewis G Adler, against Auto Serices Companyinc, represented by Christopher J Michie, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with Jsc J Christopher Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
ORDER TO PAY COUNSEL FEES - DENIED by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC
Date: August 28, 2018CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV2018120769]
Date: February 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PAY COUNSEL FEES - DENIED by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL DISCOVERY-Denied by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20181051508] | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RECONSIDER-Partial by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV2018992326] | |
July 06, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
||
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by ADLER, LEWIS, G of LEWIS G. ADLER on behalf of VINCENT DOBBINS, VINCENT DOBBINS, TAMERA DOBBINS, TAMERA DOBBINS against AUTO SERICES COMPANYINC *LINKED FILING* | |
June 22, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
||
June 22, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO STAY CASE
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
||
June 22, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
||
June 22, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
||
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.