Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Darrell Choates Sr, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against David A Dovel, Deborah Hospital, Dovel A David, Marissa Dovell, represented by Joseph A D'Aversa, Lora M Foley, R James Kravitz, in the jurisdiction of Burlington County, NJ, . Burlington County, NJ Superior Courts with Richard L Hertzberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2023 |
CategoryDefamation |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBurlington County, NJ |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Darrell Choates Sr against Deborah Hospital and David A. Dovell. The complaint alleges false accusation and wrongful prosecution by Deborah Hospital and David A. Dovell. The jurisdiction of the court is established based on...
Amended Complaint submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2346842
Date: December 02, 2023Reply brief submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2346844
Date: December 02, 2023ORDER TO BAR-Denied by Judge HERTZBERG, RICHARD, L re: MOTION TO BAR [LCV20232383858]
Date: November 08, 2023Deficiency correction submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1992409
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER INTERVENE-Granted by Judge HERTZBERG, RICHARD, L re: MOTION TO INTERVENE [LCV20232124452]
Date: November 08, 2023Deficiency correction submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1990782
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER RECONSIDER-Denied by Judge HERTZBERG, RICHARD, L re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20232339661]
Date: November 08, 2023Brief/Letter Brief submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2278546
Date: October 24, 2023General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SANDRA CHOATES
Date: October 24, 2023Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR *LINKED FILING*
Date: September 26, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1988008
Date: June 23, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 29, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2238305
Date: October 03, 2023Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR *LINKED FILING*
Date: September 25, 2023Objection to motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2274952
Date: October 23, 2023Deficiency correction submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2224851
Date: September 26, 2023Deficiency correction submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2224590
Date: September 25, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2215083
Date: September 20, 2023Brief/Letter Brief submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2206080
Date: September 14, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2187159
Date: September 06, 2023Adjournment Request uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: August 24, 2023General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: September 14, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2183877
Date: September 03, 2023General Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: September 11, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2159312
Date: August 20, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2168331
Date: August 24, 2023General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: August 18, 2023Adjournment Request uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: September 06, 2023General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: September 09, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2195109
Date: September 09, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2159162
Date: August 20, 2023Objection to motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2107411
Date: July 23, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2106487
Date: July 21, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2107414
Date: July 23, 2023Proof of Service submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134621
Date: August 07, 2023Proof of Service submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134609
Date: August 07, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134556
Date: August 07, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134530
Date: August 07, 2023Brief/Letter Brief submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2107412
Date: July 23, 2023General Correspondence uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: August 04, 2023Amended Answer submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2132926
Date: August 04, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2115196
Date: July 26, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2129921
Date: August 03, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2109656
Date: July 24, 2023Response to Amended Complaint submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2148234
Date: August 14, 2023Amended Complaint submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2103559
Date: July 20, 2023Proof of Service submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134679
Date: August 07, 2023Response to Counterclaim submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2103483
Date: July 20, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2129936
Date: August 03, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2101507
Date: July 19, 2023Proof of Service submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134670
Date: August 07, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2148330
Date: August 14, 2023Proof of Service submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2134640
Date: August 07, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2073682
Date: July 05, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2347006
Date: December 02, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2347002
Date: December 02, 2023Objection to motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2115201
Date: July 26, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2074244
Date: July 05, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2078932
Date: July 07, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2082601
Date: July 11, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2115193
Date: July 26, 2023Motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2346841
Date: December 02, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2082604
Date: July 11, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 10, 2023Amended Answer uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOSEPH A D'AVERSA
Date: November 08, 2023Objection to motion submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2275461
Date: October 23, 2023Brief/Letter Brief submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2156915
Date: August 18, 2023Response to Crossclaim submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1988020
Date: May 15, 2023Letter/Correspondence submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1964176
Date: May 02, 2023Proof of Service submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1964153
Date: May 02, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 04, 2023Affidavit submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-1957479
Date: April 27, 2023Affidavit Of Merit uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by DARRELL CHOATES SR
Date: April 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: RICHARD L HERTZBERG |
||
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by D'AVERSA, JOSEPH, A of DE NITTIS OSEFCHEN AND PRINCE PC on behalf of DARRELL CHOATES SR, DEBORAH HOSPITAL, CHOATES SANDRA against DAVID A DOVEL, MARISSA DOVELL *LINKED FILING* | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by KRAVITZ, R, JAMES of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP on behalf of DAVID A DOVEL against DARRELL CHOATES SR *LINKED FILING* | |
December 07, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: RICHARD L HERTZBERG |
||
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20233529783] -The CMC scheduled tomorrow 12/7 is adjourned by the Court | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE for Letter/Correspondence LCV20233525419 Other-Data Submitted Does Not Match this case. Notice of Appearance for L-2158-23 MUST be filed on the correct case in eCourts by counsel. Thank you! | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/02/2023 will be decided on 01/05/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20233529783] | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE for Amended Complaint LCV20233521804 Other-Data Submitted Does Not Match this case. Please re-file your Amended Complaint in the appropriate case (BUR L-2158-23.) Thank you! | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE for Letter/Correspondence LCV20233525412 Other-Data Submitted Does Not Match this case. Notice of Appearance for L-2158-23 MUST be filed on the correct case in eCourts by counsel. Thank you! | |
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint submitted by Darrell Choates. JEDS EF-2346842 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.