Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
On Behalf Of Others Similarly Situated, Xiong, Chia, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by David Yeremian, Jason Rothman, against Does 1-50, Tgc Enterprises Inc, represented by Erica L Rosasco, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid De Alba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2020 |
Category(Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended class action complaint filed by Plaintiff Chia Xiong against TGC Enterprises, Inc. and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges various violations of the California Labor Code, Industrial Welfare Commission (IWC) ord...
Summons filed.
Date: May 14, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 01/15/2021 11:00:00 AM .
Date: January 15, 2021Joint Stipulation to continue case management conference - ORDER
Date: April 12, 2021Minutes finalized for heard on 04/18/2022 08:43:00 AM .
Date: April 18, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 18, 2022Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.
Date: June 17, 2020Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures
Date: October 23, 2020Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/03/2020 03:00:00 PM .
Date: December 03, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: February 01, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 01/12/2022 10:26:00 AM .
Date: January 12, 2022Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: June 03, 2020Answer (To First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: September 23, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 01, 2021Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 03, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: January 12, 2022Complaint filed.
Date: May 14, 2020Notice - Other (Of Case Management Conference and Complex Case Management Procedures) filed.
Date: November 23, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: February 03, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: November 19, 2021Notice - Other (Of Continued Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: December 15, 2021Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 02/18/2022 08:30:00 AM .
Date: February 18, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: May 14, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: June 17, 2020Proof of Service filed.
Date: September 09, 2020Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (and Protective Order) filed.
Date: December 03, 2020Order - Other (Protective Order) filed.
Date: December 07, 2020Notice - Other (Of Order Reassigning Case) filed.
Date: February 03, 2022Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: March 01, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/19/2021 10:30:00 AM .
Date: November 19, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Statement filed.
Date: July 08, 2021Case Management Statement filed.
Date: July 16, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 23, 2021Notice - Other (Of Continued Case Conference) filed.
Date: July 27, 2021Minutes finalized for heard on 08/06/2021 03:16:00 PM .
Date: August 06, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 06, 2021Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Complex set on 09/08/2022 01:30:00 PM published .
Date: September 07, 2022Notice - Other (Continued Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: September 29, 2022Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: August 25, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 02/02/2023 01:30:00 PM .
Date: February 02, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: January 03, 2023Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 09/08/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: September 08, 2022Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 19, 2022Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: April 28, 2022Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 18, 2023Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 19, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/03/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: November 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 |
Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . Disposition |
||
February 02, 2023 |
Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Complex rescheduled to 05/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Complex continued to 05/04/2023 at 01:30 in this department. | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . | |
February 02, 2023 |
Case Management Conference - Complex scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . Scheduling |
||
February 02, 2023 |
Case Management Conference - Complex rescheduled to 05/04/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 28 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
February 02, 2023 |
Case Management Conference - Complex continued to 05/04/2023 at 01:30 in this department. Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.