Contents

Details Case Events

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Plaintiff(S) Vs. U.S. Currency $1,442.00, Defendant(S)

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .

Case Details for Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Plaintiff(S) Vs. U.S. Currency $1,442.00, Defendant(S)

Filing Date

November 01, 2021

Category

Other Civil Matters

Last Refreshed

June 15, 2022

Filing Location

Clark County, NV

Case Events for Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Plaintiff(S) Vs. U.S. Currency $1,442.00, Defendant(S)

Type Description
Docket Event Motion to Stay
Claimant's Motion to Stay Forfeiture Case

Judge: Kishner, Joanna S.

Docket Event All Pending Motions
MOTION TO STAY... DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Upon Court's inquiry, Ms. Strand acknowledged her non-compliance with Administrative Order 22-07 and stated she planned to appear in person, however, she was experiencing COVID symptoms. Ms. Strand asserted the matter paralleled a criminal case, the cases were similar and the Court could stay the adjudication and consider prejudice. Ms. Stand further stated a stay would not prejudice LVMPD, at this time trial was not pending nor a Complaint filed, however anticipated, and Ms. Strand requested the Court stay the matter until the criminal matter was resolved. Mr. Greenberg noted the related criminal case number was listed incorrectly in the Motion, should have read 21-PC-032557 and the hearing was set for July 7, 2022 in the Justice Court. Mr. Greenberg further stated the Reply contained new information which was inappropriate to raise in a Reply and discovery had yet to be conducted. Colloquy regarding 5th Amendment. Court stated its Findings and ORDERED Motion to Stay Forfeiture DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; noting arguments were speculative. COURT DIRECTED Mr. Greenberg to prepare the Order with detailed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, circulate to opposing counsel, and submit to the Court pursuant to EDCR 7.21 and the current Administrative Orders.

Judge: Kishner, Joanna S.

Docket Event Memorandum Doc ID# 14
[14] Court's Memo RE: Remote Appearance Information for JUNE 14, 2022, Hearing **PLEASE REVIEW IN ITS ENTIRETY**
Docket Event Discovery Conference
Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Greenberg stated the matter was exempt from 16.1 and Claimant's Motion to Stay was set for hearing on 6/14/22. Ms. Greenberg requested the matter be continued to 6/14/22 considering if the Motion to Stay was granted there would be not need for a Discovery Order. Mr. Greenberg further stated he would e-mail Ms. Strand discovery requests in the interim. Ms. Strand concurred. Court ORDERED matter CONTINUED pursuant to Counsels' joint request. 6/14/22 9:00 A.M. CONTINUED: DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Judge: Kishner, Joanna S.

Docket Event Opposition to Motion Doc ID# 11
[11] Opposition to Motion for Stay
Docket Event Memorandum Doc ID# 12
[12] Court's Memo RE: Remote Appearance Information for MAY 26, 2022, Hearing **PLEASE REVIEW IN ITS ENTIRETY**
Docket Event Reply Doc ID# 13
[13] Reply to Government Opposition to Stay
Docket Event Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 10
[10] Notice of Hearing
Docket Event Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 8
[8] Notice of Order Setting Hearing
Docket Event Motion to Stay Doc ID# 9
[9] Motion to Stay Forfeiture Case
See all events