Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC VS. MANUEL LUNA
A Rule 3.740 Collections case was filed by Greater California Financial Company, Llc, against Manuel Luna, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. Judge Craig E. Arthur presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 17, 2007
Last Refreshed
May 04, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Tam Nomoto Schumann;Category
RULE 3.740 COLLECTIONS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
6 years, 4 months and 11 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 3115339 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2014 02:22:22 PM. | |
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 02/19/2014 |
|
July 12, 2013 | Docket Event | E-FILING TRANSACTION 445290 RECEIVED ON 07/05/2013 09:18:52 AM. | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 07/05/2013 |
|
June 30, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED FROM NORTH JUSTICE CENTER TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013. | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 05/10/2010 |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS IN ENVELOPE | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 09/17/2009 01:30:00 PM. |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR RESTORE TO 09/17/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
Judge: B. Tam Nomoto Schumann |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER. | |
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 06/18/2009 |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10404209 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10228083. |
|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 05/12/2009 |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - Abstract of Judgment IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10294340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10118215. |
|
January 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment ISSUED | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10242987 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10066862. |
|
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED AS TO ORANGE COUNTY | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 10/14/2008 |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION - OTHER (CLERKS) FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 01/31/2008 |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 01/31/2008 |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 5898.32 PRINCIPAL, 230.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST LUNA, MANUEL | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 01/31/2008 |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | DRAP - CLERKS | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 01/31/2008 |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY Summons & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 12/13/2007 | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 30 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 180.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10001671 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 26172. | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 10/17/2007 | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 FILED BY GREATER CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL COMPANY, LLC ON 10/17/2007 |