Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dry , Fredrick E., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pipkins , Curtis Lee, against Deatherage , Samuel, Deatherage , Trish, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with GROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2020 |
CategoryAc Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Amended Judgment
Date: August 18, 2020Judgment Entered
Date: July 20, 2020Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: August 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Judgment Associated Entries: 07/20/2020 - Judgment Entered Judgment entered |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Judgment | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court Amended Judgment Transcribed.. |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Reconsider | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Court reviews file. Motion to reconsider is well taken. Due to clerical error, original judgment excluded damages proven. Amended judgment to issue. RMG Associated Entries: 08/14/2020 - Motion to Reconsider Motion to Reconsider Judgment. |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reconsider Judgment. Filed By: CURTIS LEE PIPKINS \n On Behalf Of: FREDRICK E. DRY \n Associated Entries: 08/14/2020 - Order Court reviews file. Motion to reconsider is well taken. Due to clerical error, original judgment excluded damages proven. Amended judgment to issue. RMG |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.