Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
M&S Sultze, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Bernatz, Michael D - Lead Attorney, against Maringer, Robert Lee, in the jurisdiction of Winona County, MN, . Winona County, MN Superior Courts with Baker, Gail presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBaker, Gail Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWinona County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Eviction Summons Index #3
Date: October 31, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #4
Date: October 31, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #5
Date: November 08, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: October 27, 2022Notice of Deficiency Judicial Officer: Baker, Gail D. Index #9
Date: December 05, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: November 28, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #13
Date: January 24, 2023Judgment Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #14
Date: January 25, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #11
Date: January 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #14 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney BERNATZ, MICHAEL D; Defendant Maringer, Robert Lee Index #15 | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #13 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #11 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Maringer, Robert Lee Index #10 | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Judicial Officer: Baker, Gail D. Index #9 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #8 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Maringer, Robert Lee Index #7 | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney BERNATZ, MICHAEL D; Defendant Maringer, Robert Lee Index #6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.