Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Certificate Of Dissolution Index # 39 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Mcleod County, MN, . Mcleod County, MN Superior Courts with Maher, Jessica J.W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaher, Jessica J.W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMcleod County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Name Granted |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: April 14, 2021Fnd of Fact-Conclusions of Law-Order for Judg and Decree
Date: April 14, 2021Summary Real Estate Disposition Judgment
Date: April 14, 2021Certificate of Dissolution
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: December 30, 2020Scheduling Order
Date: December 29, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 24, 2020Order-Other
Date: June 23, 2020Remote Hearing Instructions Provided
Date: June 15, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: June 15, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: March 06, 2020ICMC Order for Social & Financial Early Neutral Evaluation
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Initial Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 2019Order-Other
Date: December 13, 2019Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index # 49 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index # 48 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 47 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order
Judge: Maher, Jessica J.W. |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order Index # 46 (Judicial Officer: Maher, Jessica J.W. )
Judge: Maher, Jessica J.W. |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 45 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.