Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lindelof, Robert Wayne, filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case represented by Madison, Mark Ryan - Lead Attorney, against Lindelof, Steven Roger, Wiehoff, Sharon Denise, in the jurisdiction of Isanti County, MN, . Isanti County, MN Superior Courts with Seabrooks II, Jesse presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIsanti County, MN |
|
Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #36
Date: August 14, 2023Judgment Index #38
Date: August 29, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #35
Date: August 14, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #37
Date: August 21, 2023Petition-Other Index #33
Date: August 14, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #34
Date: August 14, 2023Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #10
Date: March 07, 2023Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #11
Date: March 07, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #16
Date: March 31, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion Index #9
Date: March 07, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: February 21, 2023Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Wiehoff, Sharon Denise Index #13
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #7
Date: February 01, 2023Other Document Index #28
Date: May 17, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #30
Date: May 26, 2023Other Document Index #29
Date: May 26, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #23
Date: April 17, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #21
Date: April 17, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #19
Date: April 10, 2023Nomination Index #22
Date: April 17, 2023Nomination Index #20
Date: April 17, 2023Judgment Index #17
Date: April 04, 2023Civil Cover Sheet Index #6
Date: January 31, 2023Complaint-Civil Index #4
Date: January 31, 2023Certify Personal Service Index #3
Date: January 31, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #26
Date: April 19, 2023Order-Other Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #25
Date: April 18, 2023Other Document Index #27
Date: May 17, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #31
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #32
Date: June 08, 2023Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Wiehoff, Sharon Denise Index #14
Date: March 15, 2023Order-Other Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #24
Date: April 18, 2023Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #15
Date: March 28, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #12
Date: March 07, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: January 31, 2023Summons Index #1
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #38 | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Defendant Lindelof, Steven Roger; Attorney MADISON, MARK RYAN; Defendant Wiehoff, Sharon Denise Index #39 | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #37 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #36 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #35 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition-Other Index #33 | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Index #34 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #32 | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #31 | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Judicial Officer: Seabrooks II, Jesse Index #30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.