Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Olchefske, John Ernest - Lead Attorney, against Timmerman, Michael, represented by Dicker, Joseph W - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Moreno, Daniel C. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoreno, Daniel C. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2016 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Other Document
Date: November 07, 2016Writ of Execution Returned
Date: November 07, 2016Writ of Execution
Date: November 07, 2016Notice of Docketing of Judgment
Date: November 03, 2016Other Document
Date: November 03, 2016Affidavit of Increased Costs
Date: November 03, 2016Other Document
Date: October 25, 2016Writ of Execution
Date: October 25, 2016Affidavit-Other
Date: October 25, 2016Request for Writ of Execution
Date: October 25, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: August 01, 2016Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor
Date: October 25, 2016Judgment
Date: August 01, 2016Order-Other
Date: July 15, 2016Order Vacating Judgment
Date: June 22, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 17, 2016Judgment
Date: June 17, 2016Affidavit of Service
Date: March 17, 2016Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order
Date: June 16, 2016Exhibit List
Date: March 17, 2016Memorandum
Date: March 17, 2016Affidavit-Other
Date: March 17, 2016Proposed Order or Document
Date: March 17, 2016Affidavit of Plaintiff
Date: March 17, 2016Notice of Case Assignment
Date: March 11, 2016Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: March 17, 2016Confidential Financial Source Documents Form 11.2
Date: March 17, 2016Affidavit of Service
Date: March 11, 2016Summons and Complaint
Date: March 11, 2016Civil Cover Sheet
Date: March 11, 2016Application for Discharge of Judgment(s) Index #34
Date: September 29, 2023Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #24
Date: October 25, 2016Writ of Execution Index #26
Date: October 25, 2016Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #28
Date: November 03, 2016Request for Writ of Execution Index #23
Date: October 25, 2016Affidavit-Other Index #25
Date: October 25, 2016Other Document Index #27
Date: October 25, 2016Affidavit of Mailing Index #36
Date: September 29, 2023Judgment Index #21
Date: August 01, 2016Writ of Execution Returned Index #31
Date: November 07, 2016Other Document Index #33
Date: November 07, 2016Notice of Motion and Motion Index #6
Date: March 17, 2016Notice of Case Assignment Index #5
Date: March 11, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #18
Date: June 17, 2016Order Vacating Judgment Index #19
Date: June 22, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #22
Date: August 01, 2016Judgment Index #17
Date: June 17, 2016Order-Other Index #20
Date: July 15, 2016Memorandum Index #13
Date: March 17, 2016Affidavit of Service Index #15
Date: March 17, 2016Proposed Order or Document Index #14
Date: March 17, 2016Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #7
Date: March 17, 2016Civil Cover Sheet Index #1
Date: March 11, 2016Summons and Complaint Index #2
Date: March 11, 2016Affidavit of Service Index #4
Date: March 11, 2016Writ of Execution Index #32
Date: November 07, 2016Notice of Docketing of Judgment Index #30
Date: November 03, 2016Affidavit-Other Index #11
Date: March 17, 2016Other Document Index #29
Date: November 03, 2016Exhibit List Index #12
Date: March 17, 2016Confidential Financial Source Documents Form 11.2 Index #9
Date: March 17, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Discharge of Judgment(s) Index #34 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #36 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Bankruptcy Document Index #35 | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned Index #31 | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Other Document Index #33 | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Index #32 | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Docketing of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.