Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stillwater Premier Bengals Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Lee, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
|
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: February 22, 2023Request for Change of Venue Filed By: Plaintiff Stillwater Premier Bengals LLC Index #5
Date: January 27, 2023Order-Change of Venue Index #1
Date: January 31, 2023Statement of Claim Index #2
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #6
Date: January 31, 2023Summons for Hearing Index #3
Date: January 27, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Index #10
Date: April 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #11 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Index #10 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Issued To: Defendant Lee, Ryan | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 10 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Venue From Index #7 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Defendant Lee, Ryan; Plaintiff Stillwater Premier Bengals LLC Index #9 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 9 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.