Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Dodge County, MN, . Dodge County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDodge County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Name Granted |
Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: July 13, 2016Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 14, 2016Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: July 13, 2016ICMC Order and Order for Pre-Trial
Date: May 16, 2016Certificate of Dissolution
Date: July 14, 2016Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: July 12, 2016Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution
Date: July 12, 2016Notice of Case Filing
Date: March 24, 2016Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Dissolution | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Name Change Sent to Secretary of State | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Findings, Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order, Judgment and Decree-Dissolution | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.