Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Cook County, MN, . Cook County, MN Superior Courts with Cuzzo, Michael J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2014 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDischarge Personal Representative |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 18, 2021Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib
Date: May 18, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: May 13, 2021Order Discharging Personal Representative
Date: May 05, 2017Petition-Other
Date: May 13, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: May 02, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 05, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 28, 2017Receipts for Assets by Distributee
Date: May 02, 2017Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative
Date: May 02, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: February 07, 2017Other Document
Date: February 28, 2017Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: February 07, 2017Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate
Date: February 06, 2017Final Accounting
Date: February 06, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: February 19, 2015Inventory
Date: February 06, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: January 16, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: November 18, 2014Order-Other
Date: June 26, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: December 17, 2014Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib
Date: February 28, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 07, 2017Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup
Date: May 13, 2014Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: April 22, 2014Order and Notice of Hearing
Date: April 23, 2014Proposed Order or Document
Date: February 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition-Other | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Discharging Personal Representative
Judge: Cuzzo, Michael J. |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipts for Assets by Distributee | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.