Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vern Hoff Land Development, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Costley, Timothy Arthur - Lead Attorney, against S.J. Bautch Construction, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, MN, . Cook County, MN Superior Courts with Cuzzo, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, MN |
|
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 28, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: August 23, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: May 04, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 25, 2022Notice-Other
Date: February 16, 2022Summons
Date: February 16, 2022Notice-Other
Date: May 04, 2022Statement of Claim
Date: February 14, 2022Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #5
Date: March 30, 2022Notice-Other Index #4
Date: February 16, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #6
Date: May 04, 2022Notice-Other Index #7
Date: May 04, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #9
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: June 14, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: February 14, 2022Summons Index #3
Date: February 16, 2022Order for Judgment and Judgment Index #16
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #15
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10
Date: July 25, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #12
Date: August 22, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #11
Date: July 28, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #14
Date: August 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #17 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Index #16 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #15 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 16 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 15 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #14 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Cuzzo, Michael J. Index #13 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.