Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Arthur, Michael Printy - Lead Attorney, against Robinson, Pauline, in the jurisdiction of Becker County, MN, . Becker County, MN Superior Courts with Anderson, Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2019 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBecker County, MN |
|
Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Thilmony, Gretchen Index #13
Date: January 16, 2020Correspondence Index #7
Date: January 14, 2020Judgment Filed By: Attorney ARTHUR, MICHAEL PRINTY; Defendant ROBINSON, PAULINE Index #14
Date: January 17, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #12
Date: January 15, 2020Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Defendant ROBINSON, PAULINE Index #11
Date: January 14, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #10
Date: January 14, 2020Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: May 20, 2019Correspondence Index #2
Date: May 20, 2019Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8
Date: January 14, 2020Exhibit List Index #9
Date: January 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #16 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index # 16 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney ARTHUR, MICHAEL PRINTY; Defendant ROBINSON, PAULINE Index #15 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Filed By: Attorney ARTHUR, MICHAEL PRINTY; Defendant ROBINSON, PAULINE Index #14 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 15 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 14 | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Thilmony, Gretchen Index #13 | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Thilmony, Gretchen )
Judge: Thilmony, Gretchen |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #12 | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.