Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
J.G. Maclellan Concrete Co., Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hall, Esq., Edwin Latham, against Enfield Builders, Inc., Western Surety Company, represented by Hedberg, Esq., Frederick E, Mackin, Esq., Douglas J, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Service Returned for Defendant Western Surety Company: Service accepted by counsel;
Date: February 01, 2021Service Returned for Defendant Enfield Builders, Inc.: Service accepted by counsel;
Date: February 01, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 23, 2020Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Enfield Builders, Inc., Western Surety Company's Notice of withdrawal of appearance (E-FILED) Applies To: Mackin, Esq., Douglas J (Attorney) on behalf of Enfield Builders, Inc. (Defendant) | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff J.G. MacLellan Concrete Co., Inc.'s Notice of Status Review of the Docket (E-FILED) Applies To: Hall, Esq., Edwin Latham (Attorney) on behalf of J.G. MacLellan Concrete Co., Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 12/13/2022 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. On this date Douglas J Mackin, Esq. added for Defendant Enfield Builders, Inc. | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Stay Proceedings and Amend Civil Tracking Order (#8.0): ALLOWED Counsel to submit a joint proposed amended tracking order when this stay is lifted. Notices mailed 6/30/21 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff J.G. MacLellan Concrete Co., Inc.'s Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and Amend Civil Tracking Order (E-FILED) | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Set Aside Defaults and to Extend Time to Respond Complaint (#7.0): ALLOWED Notices mailed 6/8/21 Judge: Ricciardone, Hon. David
Judge: Ricciardone, David |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Enfield Builders, Inc.'s Assented to Motion to Set aside defaults and to extend time to respond complaint. | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Enfield Builders, Inc.: Defaulted under time standards; a motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass. R. Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 6/23/21 or complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendant Western Surety Company: Defaulted under time standards; a motion for an assessment of damages and default judgment pursuant to Mass. R. Civ.P.55(b)2 and subject to Mass.R.Civ.P.54(b) and 55(b)4 as amended by 6/23/21 or complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.