Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Fallon Ambulance Service Llc, Transformative Healthcare Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Boudett, Esq., Michael P, Fullmer, Esq., James Samuel, Olesen, Esq., Erin Josva, Theodorou, Esq., Nicholas C, against Randseco Llc, Tyler, Patrick Sean, represented by Davidson, Esq., Shepard, Mittelman, Esq., Laura Lee, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, MA, . Suffolk County, MA Superior Courts with Green, Karen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryBusiness Litigation |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Affidavit of James S. Fullmer
Date: December 06, 2021Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Letter Rogatory filed by Patrick Sean Tyler, Randseco LLC
Date: December 06, 2021Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Letter Rogatory
Date: December 06, 2021Defendants Patrick Sean Tyler, Randseco LLC's Submission of Rule 9A Notice of Filing
Date: March 29, 2022Plaintiff Transformative Healthcare Inc's Certificate of Service
Date: March 26, 2021Plaintiff Transformative Healthcare Inc's Submission of Rule 9A List of Documents
Date: March 26, 2021Plaintiff Transformative Healthcare Inc's Notice of Filing--Rule 9A
Date: March 26, 2021Affidavit Rule 9A Affidavit
Date: March 26, 2021Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: March 18, 2021ORDER: tracking order (dated 2/26/21) notice sent 3/05/21
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER: Protective Order Notice Sent 2/5/21 See Page #9 for order
Date: February 09, 2021Received from Defendant Randseco LLC, Tyler, Patrick Sean: Answer to original complaint;
Date: November 16, 2020Service Returned for Defendant Tyler, Patrick Sean: Service made in hand;
Date: November 06, 2020Service Returned for Defendant Randseco LLC: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: November 06, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 16, 2020Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 07/12/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Helene Kazanjian, Presiding Staff: Gloria Brooks, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kazanjian, Helene |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 05/13/2022 12:28:04 | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 05/16/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Peter B Krupp, Presiding Staff: Gloria Brooks, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Krupp, Peter B |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/26/2022 07:54:57 | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 04/27/2022 03:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Peter B Krupp, Presiding Staff: Gloria Brooks, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Krupp, Peter B |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/12/2022 17:44:17 | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants Patrick Sean Tyler, Randseco LLC's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (w/opposition) | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Patrick Sean Tyler, Randseco LLC's Reply Memorandum in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Patrick Sean Tyler, Randseco LLC's Memorandum in support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (P#20) filed by Transformative Healthcare Inc, Fallon Ambulance Service LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.