Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kamel, Peter, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Cullen, Esq., Sean B, Friedmann, Esq., Jonathon David, Rumson, Esq., Mark Taylor, Sack, Esq., Casey A, against Amelina, Maria, represented by Richmond, Esq., Laurence Kent, Weberg, Esq., Kristin Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christopher KBarry-Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher KBarry-Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: April 14, 2021Rule 9A notice of filing
Date: December 02, 2022Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Certificate of Service
Date: December 02, 2022Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Kamel, Peter (Plaintiff)
Date: December 02, 2022Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: December 02, 2022Peter Kamel's Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's motion to compel P#32
Date: December 02, 2022Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Motion to permit late disclosure of expert witnesses.
Date: August 16, 2023Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Sean B Cullen, Esq.
Date: November 28, 2022Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Certificate of service.
Date: August 16, 2023Affidavit in compliance under superior court rule 9A and receipt of limited opposition.
Date: August 16, 2023Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiff's reply to defendant's limited opposition to #44 motion.
Date: August 16, 2023Peter Kamel's Memorandum of law in support of #44 motion.
Date: August 16, 2023Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Kristin Nicole Weberg, Esq.
Date: November 16, 2022Exhibits/Appendix
Date: June 12, 2023Exhibits/Appendix (Exhibit Deposition Subpoenas Duces Tecum Agranovich Kladova)
Date: November 16, 2022Exhibits/Appendix (Exhibit A Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Keeper of Records Visage Sculpture)
Date: November 15, 2022Conference Memorandum Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum
Date: May 19, 2023Exhibits/Appendix
Date: June 09, 2023Opposition to to filed by Peter KamelEmergency Motion to Compel
Date: February 03, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Sean Cullen
Date: November 15, 2022Affidavit of Avi Liss, Esq.
Date: November 08, 2021Affidavit of Elena Kladova
Date: November 08, 2021Affidavit of Elena Kladova
Date: September 09, 2021Exhibits/Appendix
Date: November 04, 2022Exhibits/Appendix
Date: November 01, 2022Peter Kamel's Memorandum in support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses
Date: September 19, 2022Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses
Date: September 19, 2022Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Received from Counterclaim Defendant Kamel, Peter: Reply to the Counterclaim;
Date: January 12, 2022Affidavit of Peter Kamel (*supplemental/reply affidavit)
Date: June 16, 2021Affidavit of Maria Amelina
Date: June 16, 2021Peter Kamel's Memorandum in opposition to to defendant's motion to dismiss
Date: May 20, 2021Affidavit of Peter Kamel
Date: June 16, 2021Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Motion for Real Estate Attachment
Date: June 16, 2021Opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss filed by Peter Kamel
Date: May 20, 2021Affidavit of Peter Kamel Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K
Date: April 07, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 07, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to permit late disclosure of expert witnesses. (#44.0): DENIED Dated 8/29/23 After hearing this day, the motion for leave to permit late disclosure of expert witnesses is DENIED for the following reasons: First, experts were required to be disclosed at the final pretrial conference, three months ago. The proposed issues to be covered by the experts have been part of this case since it was filed, and no reason has been offered why the expert proposal did not surface earlier. Therefore, in exercise of my discretion, I decline to expand the deadline. Second, at each interaction, I have had with this case and these parties, I have urged that this relationship-based dispute be narrowed not broadened in scope, though to little avail. Here, in the context of expanding expert deadline, I opt against making the case more complex and broader in scope. Third, the concept of valuing the home so that Kamel may claim entitlement to damages for half the home's value strikes me as in direct contradiction to my ruling concerning the Statue of Frauds made at the motion to dismiss stage. Fourth, the plaintiff's description of anticipated evidence that could conceivably lead to a claim to recover some aspect of the valuation of defendants' companies was not compelling to the degree necessary to extend the expert deadline. So Ordered. | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 08/29/2023 03:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding email sent informing parties that pleading #44 will be heard on 8/29 along with the summary judgment motion if filed. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Motion to permit late disclosure of expert witnesses. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Peter Kamel's Certificate of service. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit in compliance under superior court rule 9A and receipt of limited opposition. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiff's reply to defendant's limited opposition to #44 motion. | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to #44 motion. filed by Maria Amelina Also Known As Masha Amelina,a/k/a Maria Banar | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Peter Kamel's Memorandum of law in support of #44 motion. | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Laurence Kent Richmond, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Maria Amelina Also Known As Masha Amelina,a/k/a Maria Banar |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.